This case was last updated from PACER on 05/29/2021 at 12:03:47 (UTC).

Kerr Machine Co. v. Vulcan Energy Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Kerr Machine Co filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vulcan Energy Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kerr Machine Co.

Defendants

Cizion, LLC doing business as Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing

Vulcan Energy Services, LLC

Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rocco Magni

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Brian D. Melton

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street - Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Meng Xi

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Jean C. Frizzell

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana Street, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Adi Sirkes

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Jeffrey S. Whittle

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

811 Main St. Suite 3130

Houston, TX 77002

Jeremy L. Doyle

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana Street, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Joshua Davis

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

811 Main St., Suite 3130

Houston, TX 77584

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magni, Rocco) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Cizion, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Vulcan Energy Services, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kerr Machine Co.. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kerr Machine Co.. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Melton for Applicant Meng Xi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14656588) by on behalf of Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#3

(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Meng Xi and Thomas V. DelRosario. (lad) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14641980). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magni, Rocco) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Cizion, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Vulcan Energy Services, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kerr Machine Co.. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (bw) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kerr Machine Co.. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meng Xi for Kerr Machine Co. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian D. Melton for Applicant Meng Xi ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14656588) by on behalf of Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Meng Xi and Thomas V. DelRosario. (lad) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14641980). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vulcan Energy Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kerr Machine Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meng Xi