This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 10:29:47 (UTC).

Kerr Machine Co. v. Vulcan Energy Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Kerr Machine Co filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Vulcan Energy Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Kerr Machine Co.

Kelcy Jake Foster

Mark S. Nowell

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing

Vulcan Energy Services, LLC

Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Rocco Magni

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1000 Louisiana, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Brian D. Melton

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Street - Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002-5096

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry J. Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

100 Light Street, 26Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Jean C. Frizzell

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana Street, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77002

Jeremy L. Doyle

Attorney at Reynolds Frizzell LLP

1100 Louisiana Street, Suite 3500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Summons Issued as to Mark S. Nowell. (am) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#26

(#26) Summons Issued as to Kelcy Jake Foster. (am) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#25

(#25) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. Request for Issuance of Summons for Mark Nowell (Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#24

(#24) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. Request for Issuance of Summons for Kelcy Jake Foster (Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

23 #6

Exhibit B

23 #5

Exhibit A-4

23 #3

Exhibit A-2

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC and Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit B)(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy L. Doyle Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Barry J. Herman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14552030) by on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

4 #3

Exhibit C

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC amending, filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14386836). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Summons Issued as to Mark S. Nowell. (am) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Summons Issued as to Kelcy Jake Foster. (am) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. Request for Issuance of Summons for Mark Nowell (Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. Request for Issuance of Summons for Kelcy Jake Foster (Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Barry J. Herman for Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, and Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC and Cizion, LLC d/b/a Vulcan Industrial Manufacturing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit B)(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Defendant Vulcan Energy Services LLC's Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, . Attorney Jean C. Frizzell added to party Vulcan Energy Services, LLC(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Kerr Machine Co., Kelcy Jake Foster, Mark S. Nowell by Vulcan Energy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Frizzell, Jean) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy L. Doyle Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Barry J. Herman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14552030) by on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy L. Doyle on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC (Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy L. Doyle on behalf of Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. Attorney Jeremy L. Doyle added to party Cizion, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy L. Doyle added to party Vulcan Energy Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy L. Doyle added to party Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC(pty:dft) (Doyle, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Cizion, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Vulcan Energy Services, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kerr Machine Co.. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cizion, LLC, Vulcan Energy Services, LLC, Vulcan Industrial Holdings, LLC amending, filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14386836). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kerr Machine Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vulcan Energy Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rocco Magni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian D. Melton