This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2022 at 10:12:44 (UTC).

Kerns v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Kerns filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Kerns

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

TransUnion, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

BMW Financial Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dawn McCraw

Attorney at Price Law Group, APC

8245 N. 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus & Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Henry Carpenter

Attorney at Carpenter Law Firm plc

210 N. Higgins Ave, Suite 336

Missoula, MT 59802

Thomas J. Leonard

Attorney at BOONE KARLBERG, P.C.

201 West Main Street, Suite 300, Po Box 9199

Missoula, MT 59807-9199

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Charles) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/23/2022. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/2/2022. (ASG) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services, LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kerns. TransUnion, LLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TransUnion, LLC answer due 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/1/2022. (ASG) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

3 #2

Certificate of Service

3 #1

Affidavit

3 #3

Main Document

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Charles) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/23/2022. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/2/2022. (ASG) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services, LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kerns. TransUnion, LLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 4/1/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Plead Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Leonard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TransUnion, LLC answer due 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/1/2022. (ASG) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Filed At The Request Of Defendant Trans Union Yitzchak Zelman appearing for Plaintiff Richard Kerns (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/23/2022. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/25/2022. (ASG) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Carpenter, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Charles Henry Carpenter appearing for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Carpenter, Charles) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kerns. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kerns. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Kerns. BMW Financial Services served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #4 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, acknowledgement of pro hac vice admission of Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. by Richard Kerns. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/16/2022. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/1/2022. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION Yitzchak Zelman, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number AMTDC-2805354.) Dawn McCraw appearing for Plaintiff Richard Kerns (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Service) (McCraw, Dawn) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (TAG) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2803319 (TAG) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard Kerns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant