This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2020 at 09:03:31 (UTC).

Kerley v. The Methodist Hospitals, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Kerley filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Methodist Hospitals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Martin and Philip P Simon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00369

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E Martin

Presiding Judge

Philip P Simon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard A. Kerley

Defendant

The Methodist Hospitals, Inc.

600 Grant Street

Gary, IN 46402

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J Hunt

Attorney at The Law Office Robert J Hunt LLC

1905 S New Market St Ste 220

Carmel, IN 46032

Robert F Hunt

Attorney at The Law Office Robert J Hunt LLC

1905 S New Market St Ste 220

Carmel, IN 46032

Christopher S Wolcott

Attorney at The Wolcott Law Firm LLC

450 E 96Th St Ste 500

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorney

Heather L Wilson

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244

 

Court Documents

#14

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit 3 - Consent of Christina Katschke

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 2 - Consent of Damesha Collins

#6

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent of Richard A. Kerley

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSet Hearings: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 11:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin (smb) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/11/2020. (smb) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 @ 11:00 AM Central Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/11/2020. (smb) Modified on 12/11/2020 to correct date (smb). (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Methodist Hospitals, Inc.. (Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Methodist Hospitals, Inc..(Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Wilson on behalf of The Methodist Hospitals, Inc. (Wilson, Heather) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Wolcott on behalf of Richard A. Kerley (Wolcott, Christopher) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Richard A. Kerley of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Forms (Third) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Consent of Christina Katschke)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Richard A. Kerley of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Forms (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Consent of Damesha Collins)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Hunt on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to The Methodist Hospitals, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket**NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nae) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Richard A. Kerley of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Form (First) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent of Richard A. Kerley)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Hunt on behalf of Richard A. Kerley (Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against The Methodist Hospitals, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4369725.), filed by Richard A. Kerley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunt, Robert) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METHODIST HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert F. Hunt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S. Wolcott