This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/03/2022 at 09:01:09 (UTC).

Kepler v. Pavestone, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 Kepler filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Pavestone, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M. Karas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-05713

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M. Karas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

June Kepler

Defendants

Pavestone, LLC

The Quikrete Companies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chandan Panigrahi

Attorney at Law Offices of Wyatt & Associates PLLC

17 Elm Street Suite C 211

Keene, NH 03431

Benjamin J Wyatt

Attorney at Law Offices of Wyatt & Associates PLLC

17 Elm Street Suite C211

Keene, NH 03431

Michael Varraso

Attorney at Law Offices of Wyatt & Associates PLLC

17 Elm Street, Suite C 211

Keene, NH 03431

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Pavestone, LLC, The Quikrete Companies, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26369969)Document filed by June Kepler..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Panigrahi, Chandan) Modified on 7/6/2022 (jgo). (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin J Wyatt on behalf of June Kepler..(Wyatt, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Varraso on behalf of June Kepler..(Varraso, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Pavestone, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. Document filed by June Kepler..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Quikrete Companies, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. Document filed by June Kepler..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The Quikrete Companies, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. Document filed by June Kepler..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Pavestone, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. Document filed by June Kepler..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Varraso on behalf of June Kepler..(Varraso, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin J Wyatt on behalf of June Kepler..(Wyatt, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Chandan Panigrahi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Panigrahi, Chandan) Modified on 7/6/2022 (jgo). (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pavestone, LLC, The Quikrete Companies, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26369969)Document filed by June Kepler..(Panigrahi, Chandan) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where dba Pavestone is a litigant

Latest cases where THE QUIKRETE COMPANIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin J. Wyatt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Varraso