This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2022 at 08:26:23 (UTC).

Keolis Transit America, Inc. v. Teamsters Union, Local 533

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Keolis Transit America, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Teamsters Union, Local 533. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00710

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keolis Transit America, Inc.

Defendant

Teamsters Union, Local 533

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Deanna L Forbush

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 700

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Tiffany Lynn Crain Altamirano

Attorney at Weinberg, Roger & Rosenfeld

3199 E. Warm Springs Road, Suite 400

Las Vegas, NV 89120

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

14 #1

Declaration Declaration of Tiffany L Crain iso Reply to Response to Motion to Di

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. Replies due by 6/20/2022. (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

12 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

12 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Gary Watson In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion

12 #1

Declaration Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Confirm, and Memorandu

12 #12

Main Document

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Teamsters Union, Local 533. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

9 #3

Proposed Order Proposed Order

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibits for Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Dismiss, and

9 #1

Declaration Declaration of Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Dismiss, and Memor

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teamsters Union, Local 533. (KF) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Error contained within document. Counsel instructed to refile, view 6 . PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. (Forbush, Deanna) Modified on 5/4/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keolis Transit America, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Teamsters Union, Local 533. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Tiffany L Crain iso Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. Replies due by 6/20/2022. (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Teamsters Union, Local 533. Responses due by 6/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Confirm, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Gary Watson In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Confirm, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketTeamsters Union, Local 533 as Cross-Claimant terminated and Keolis Transit America, Inc. as Cross Defendant terminated as No Crossclaim was filed. (DRS) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event, "Answer" was selected. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #9 as a Motion to Dismiss. The Document filed at #9 will be Errored out. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Teamsters Union, Local 533. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed Erroneously by Counsel. Party to refile the document as directed by 11 Clerk's Notice. ANSWER to Complaint (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2022.), CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Teamsters Union, Local 533. filed by Teamsters Union, Local 533. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit Exhibits for Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Cross Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crain Altamirano, Tiffany) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 6/1/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teamsters Union, Local 533. (KF) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required as to ECF Nos. #3 and #5 . The #3 Proposed summons has the incorrect attorney to whom the Answer/Response should be returned. The proposed summons has it returning to Defendant's counsel. Plaintiff's Counsel is advised to re-file a corrected Proposed summons. Counsel is also advised the Summons issued at #5 will be locked as "filed in error by the clerk". (no image attached) (DRS) Modified on 5/4/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Issued in error by the Clerk's Office. Counsel directed to refile corrected document at 6 . SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teamsters Union, Local 533. (KF) Modified on 5/4/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (KF) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Error contained within document. Counsel instructed to refile, view 6 . PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. (Forbush, Deanna) Modified on 5/4/2022 (DRS). (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Keolis Transit America, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION and Notice to Vacate Arbitration Award with Incorporated Memo of Points and Authority (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6890330) by Plaintiff Keolis Transit America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Forbush, Deanna) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEOLIS TRANSIT AMERICA INC is a litigant