This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2021 at 07:59:05 (UTC).

KEOHANE v. INCH et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 KEOHANE filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against INCH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARTIN A FITZPATRICK and WILLIAM STAFFORD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

MARTIN A FITZPATRICK

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM STAFFORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REIYN J KEOHANE

Raiford, FL 32083

Defendants

J COKER

TODD

FDOC GENDER DISPOSITION REVIEW TEAM

DIX

PALMER

E HAND

HOWARD E TUCKER, III

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER TANNER

OLDS

MARK S INCH

FDOC LEGAL DEPARTMENT

MICHELLE SCHOUEST

A W MCLELLAN

G ESPINO

TAMERA POYNTER

T BOWDEN

NOLES

MARCHANT

JARROD

1 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - The Report and Recommendation, ECF No. #5 , entered in this case is VACATED. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff another application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 3/4/2021, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). Ruling on Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel, ECF No. #8 , is DEFERRED. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #7 , is DENIED without prejudice as insufficient. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 3/4/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 2/4/2021. (cle) *** IFP Packet sent to the Plaintiff. *** (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (cle) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by REIYN J KEOHANE. (cle) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by REIYN J KEOHANE. (cle) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation, filed by REIYN J KEOHANE. (cle) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *** VACATED per #9 Order *** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: #1 Complaint. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 1/20/2021. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/17/2021. (cle) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #3 ORDER. The deadline to pay the Filing Fee or file an IFP has expired. Neither has been filed. (cle) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #4 NOTICE of Related Case. (cle) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case, filed by REIYN J KEOHANE. (cle) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER - re: #1 Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packet for requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 1/11/2021, to either: (1) file a motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis or (2) pay the full amount of the filing fee ($400.00 if paid in full). The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 1/11/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 12/10/2020. (cle) *** IFP Packet sent to the Plaintiff. *** (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #1 Complaint. (cle) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Pro Se. (cle) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against T BOWDEN, J COKER, DIX, G ESPINO, FDOC GENDER DISPOSITION REVIEW TEAM, FDOC LEGAL DEPARTMENT, GOULD, E HAND, MARK S INCH, JARROD, MARCHANT, A W MCLELLAN, NOLES, OLDS, PALMER, TAMERA POYNTER, MICHELLE SCHOUEST, TANNER, TODD, HOWARD E TUCKER, III, filed by REIYN J KEOHANE. (cle) *** No Service Copies provided. No IFP filed or Filing Fee paid. *** (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marchant is a litigant

Latest cases where Noles is a litigant

Latest cases where Dix is a litigant

Latest cases where Todd A Govig is a litigant