This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2022 at 06:18:22 (UTC).

Kent v. Syngenta AG et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Kent filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-PQ-01374

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Kent

Defendants

Syngenta AG

Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC

Chevron USA, Inc.

Special Master

Randi Ellis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Khaldoun A. Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Shoemake Doles

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe - St. Louis

8235 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley H. Weidenhammer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Leslie M. Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester, P.C.

15 North First Street, Suite A

Belleville, IL 62220

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Washington DC

1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca C. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Jihan E. Walker

Attorney at Jones Day - Chicago

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4800

Chicago, IL 60606

Megan Ann Scheiderer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Kansas City

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Celeste M. Brecht

Attorney at Venable LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

15 #1

*Restricted*

15 #15

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#14

(#14) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.CTO-25 transferring case to the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by MDL Panel on 6/22/2022. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#13

(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Kent.. (Baughman, Laura) (Filed on 6/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#12

(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/23/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

11 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

11 #11

Main Document

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chevron USA Inc... (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant Chevron USA Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron USA Inc. re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, #6 Notice (Other), #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

6 #1

Declaration

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. and Chevron Corporation, Other Affiliate Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

1 #5

Addendum re Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit B

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-03183. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE.CTO-25 transferring case to the Southern District of Illinois. Signed by MDL Panel on 6/22/2022. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Kent.. (Baughman, Laura) (Filed on 6/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2022. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/23/2022. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 06/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chevron USA Inc... (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/22/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant Chevron USA Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron USA Inc. re #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, #6 Notice (Other), #4 Certificate of Interested Entities (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Chevron USA Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 U.S.C. 1446(D) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. and Chevron Corporation, Other Affiliate Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA Inc.. (Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/6/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2022 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/15/2022. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C22-01069. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17225375). Filed byChevron USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Addendum re Related Cases, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brecht, Celeste) (Filed on 6/1/2022) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2022.] (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Syngenta Crop Protection L L C is a litigant

Latest cases where Syngenta, AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant