This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 08:32:16 (UTC).

KENT v. KERMANS FLOORING, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 KENT filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02844

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTUMN KENT

Defendant

KERMANS FLOORING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Dutkanych, III

Attorney at BIESECKER DUTKANYCH & MACER LLC (Indianapolis)

144 N. Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Lauren Elizabeth Berger

Attorney at BIESECKER DUTKANYCH & MACER LLC (Evansville)

411 Main St.

Evansville, IN 47708

Defendant Attorneys

Bianca Black

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Emily L. Connor

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by KERMANS FLOORING, LLC.(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KERMANS FLOORING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Artisan Design Group LLC for KERMANS FLOORING, LLC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2021 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/4/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KERMANS FLOORING, LLC (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Black on behalf of Defendant KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by AUTUMN KENT. KERMANS FLOORING, LLC served on 11/5/2020. (Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff AUTUMN KENT. (Dutkanych, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Berger on behalf of Plaintiff AUTUMN KENT. (Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against KERMANS FLOORING, LLC, filed by AUTUMN KENT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6256774) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by KERMANS FLOORING, LLC.(Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KERMANS FLOORING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Artisan Design Group LLC for KERMANS FLOORING, LLC.. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2021 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/4/2020.(SWM) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L. Connor on behalf of Defendant KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. (Connor, Emily) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Automatic Initial Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KERMANS FLOORING, LLC (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Black on behalf of Defendant KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by AUTUMN KENT. KERMANS FLOORING, LLC served on 11/5/2020. (Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to KERMANS FLOORING, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff AUTUMN KENT. (Dutkanych, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Berger on behalf of Plaintiff AUTUMN KENT. (Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KERMANS FLOORING, LLC, filed by AUTUMN KENT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-6256774) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Elizabeth Berger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Dutkanych, III