This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2019 at 08:10:10 (UTC).

Kent v. Array BioPharma Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Kent filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Array BioPharma Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01248

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Kent

Defendants

John A. Orwin

Array BioPharma Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Gwen A. Fyfe

Ron Squarer

Kyle A. Lefkoff

Charles M. Baum

Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc.

Shalini Sharp

Carrie S. Cox

Gil J. Van Lunsen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gina M. Serra

Brian D. Long

Seth D. Rigrodsky

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph O. Larkin

Ronald N. Brown, III

Robert Scott Saunders

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Kent (Long, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Array BioPharma Inc.. (Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Saunders on behalf of Array BioPharma Inc., Charles M. Baum, Carrie S. Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen (Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT - filed with Jury Demand against Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc., Array BioPharma Inc., Charles M. Baum, Carrie S. Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Pfizer Inc., Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2677526.) - filed by Michael Kent. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CLOSED per D.I. #5 . (dlw) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Kent (Long, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Array BioPharma Inc.. (Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Saunders on behalf of Array BioPharma Inc., Charles M. Baum, Carrie S. Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen (Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • No Summons Issued. (lak) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT - filed with Jury Demand against Arlington Acquisition Sub Inc., Array BioPharma Inc., Charles M. Baum, Carrie S. Cox, Gwen A. Fyfe, Kyle A. Lefkoff, John A. Orwin, Pfizer Inc., Shalini Sharp, Ron Squarer, Gil J. Van Lunsen - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2677526.) - filed by Michael Kent. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less