This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:55:02 (UTC).

Kent International, Inc. v. Assemblers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Kent International, Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Assemblers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00262

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kent International, Inc.

Defendant

Assemblers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arlene C Matthews

Attorney at Crenshaw Dupree & Milam LLP

4411 98Th Street, 4Th Floor

Lubbock, TX 79424

Thomas E Ganucheau

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney St, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Defendant Attorneys

Wess H Tribble

Attorney at Tribble & Ross

6371 Richmond Avenue

Houston, TX 77057

Monica Celeste Vaughan

Attorney at Tribble | Ross

6371 Richmond Avenue`

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2020. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2020. Motions for summary judgment due by 1/4/2021. Motions in Limine due by 05/17/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/13/2020) (bdg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assemblers, Inc.. (Tribble, Wess) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Celeste Vaughan on behalf of Assemblers, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Assemblers, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Monica Celeste Vaughan added to party Assemblers, Inc.(pty:dft) (Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Assemblers, Inc.; served on 12/17/2019. (krr) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Assemblers, Inc. on 12/9/2019. (bdg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kent International, Inc.. (Matthews, Arlene) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Assemblers, Inc. filed by Kent International, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10461113) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Matthews, Arlene) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/4/2020. Discovery due by 5/17/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/4/2020. Motions for summary judgment due by 1/4/2021. Motions in Limine due by 05/17/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom C-216, 1205 Texas Avenue, Lubbock, TX 79401-4091 before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 1/13/2020) (bdg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assemblers, Inc.. (Tribble, Wess) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Celeste Vaughan on behalf of Assemblers, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Assemblers, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Monica Celeste Vaughan added to party Assemblers, Inc.(pty:dft) (Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Assemblers, Inc.; served on 12/17/2019. (krr) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Assemblers, Inc. on 12/9/2019. (bdg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdg) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kent International, Inc.. (Matthews, Arlene) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Assemblers, Inc. filed by Kent International, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10461113) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Matthews, Arlene) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less