This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:35:06 (UTC).

Kenny Paredes v. Angelica Bracamontes

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Kenny Paredes filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Angelica Bracamontes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10330

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenny Paredes

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant

Angelica Bracamontes

Los Angeles, CA 90001

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Case No. 19STUD09295. (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (see document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STUD09295 with CONFORMED FILED copy complaint. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Filing fee $400, filed by Defendant Angelica Bracamontes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Reason: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Other: Defendant seeks to proceed in forma pauperis in removing a state court unlawful detainer action to federal court for which there is no federal jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#8

(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Angelica Bracamontes (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Angelica Bracamontes. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Receipt of acknowledgment letter from Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Case No. 19STUD09295. (bm) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California listed above, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (see document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis: IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Reason: District Court lacks jurisdiction. Other: Defendant seeks to proceed in forma pauperis in removing a state court unlawful detainer action to federal court for which there is no federal jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Angelica Bracamontes. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Angelica Bracamontes (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STUD09295 with CONFORMED FILED copy complaint. Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Filing fee $400, filed by Defendant Angelica Bracamontes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.