This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 13:15:26 (UTC).

Kenneth Tokita v. Wesley Bush

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Kenneth Tokita filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Wesley Bush. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09459

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Tokita

Defendant

Wesley Bush

Torrance, CA 90501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent Real

Attorney at Law Offices of Vincent Real

3625 Del Amo Boulevard Suite 340

Torrance, CA 90503

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wesley Bush, (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Defendant Wesley Bush. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, #3 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS ORDERED that the Reqisitered to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby remanded to state court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Southwest District, Inglewood Court, One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301. Case number 21IWUD00512 (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#9

(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, Southwest District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, Southwest District,Inglewood, CA. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#10

(#10) RECEIPT of CV-103 (05/18) LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT (CIVIL) received on December 20, 2021 by Deputy Clerk (shb) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RECEIPT of CV-103 (05/18) LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT (CIVIL) received on December 20, 2021 by Deputy Clerk (shb) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, Southwest District. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, Southwest District,Inglewood, CA. (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder remanding case to Los Angeles Superior Court, Southwest District, Inglewood Court, One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301. Case number 21IWUD00512 (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, #3 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS ORDERED that the Reqisitered to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby remanded to state court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (shb) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Defendant Wesley Bush. (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wesley Bush, (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles, case number 21IWUD00512 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Filed by Defendant Wesley Bush. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less