This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2020 at 10:07:56 (UTC).

Kenneth Bennett v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Kenneth Bennett filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Reliastar Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06529

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Bennett

Defendant

Reliastar Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig M Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-5005

Jack B Winters, Jr

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Sarah Ball

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Georg Capielo

Attorney at Winters and Associates

8489 La Mesa Boulevard

La Mesa, CA 91942

Alex Tomasevic

Attorney at Nicholas and Tomasevic LLP

225 Broadway 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Alec S DiMario

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1055 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 500

Pasadena, CA 91106

Jodi Krystyn Swick

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1 Kaiser Plaza Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

Allison Jean Fernandez

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

One Kaiser Plaza, Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice

#18

(#18) REPLY in suuport of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case #13 filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)(Fernandez, Allison) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

17 #6

Declaration of Alex Tomasevic

17 #5

Exhibit 4

17 #4

Exhibit 3

17 #3

Exhibit 2

17 #2

Exhibit 1

13 #10

Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss

13 #9

Exhibit H - iso Request for Judicial Notice

13 #8

Exhibit G - iso Request for Judicial Notice

13 #7

Exhibit F - iso Request for Judicial Notice

13 #6

Exhibit E - iso Request for Judicial Notice

13 #5

Exhibit D - iso Request for Judicial Notice

13 #4

Exhibit C - iso Request for Judical Notice

13 #3

Exhibit B - iso Request for Judicial Notice

13 #2

Exhibit A - iso Request for Judical Notice

13 #1

Request for Judicial Notice iso Motion

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice iso Motion, #2 Exhibit A - iso Request for Judical Notice, #3 Exhibit B - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C - iso Request for Judical Notice, #5 Exhibit D - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit E - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit F - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit G - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit H - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Allison Jean Fernandez added to party Reliastar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (Fernandez, Allison) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY in suuport of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case #13 filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)(Fernandez, Allison) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case #13 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Alex Tomasevic)(Tomasevic, Alex) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company, identifying Voya Holdings, Inc.; Voya Financial, Inc.. (Fernandez, Allison) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case #13 by Clerk of Court. The document is accepted as filed. Defendant must file its notice of interested parties by Friday, August 21, 2020. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case filed by Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice iso Motion, #2 Exhibit A - iso Request for Judical Notice, #3 Exhibit B - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C - iso Request for Judical Notice, #5 Exhibit D - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit E - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit F - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit G - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit H - iso Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss) (Attorney Allison Jean Fernandez added to party Reliastar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (Fernandez, Allison) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett, upon Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company served on 7/23/2020, answer due 8/13/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. [See document for further details.] (et) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. (lh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sarah Ball on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett (Attorney Sarah Ball added to party Kenneth Bennett(pty:pla))(Ball, Sarah) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Georg Capielo on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett (Attorney Georg Capielo added to party Kenneth Bennett(pty:pla))(Capielo, Georg) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jack B Winters, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett (Attorney Jack B Winters, Jr added to party Kenneth Bennett(pty:pla))(Winters, Jack) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett, (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27317292 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Craig M Nicholas added to party Kenneth Bennett(pty:pla))(Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RELIASTAR LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alec S DiMario

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jodi Krystyn Swick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison Jean Fernandez