This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 08:03:41 (UTC).

Brian Kennedy v. United States Liability Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Brian Kennedy filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United States Liability Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05738

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Kennedy

Defendants

United States Liability Insurance Company

Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc

SGD Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher J Heck

Johnny White

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Yu Sacro

Larry Mark Golub

Richard David Bremer

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit 1

#17

(#17) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 (Filed in Support of Plaintiff Brian Kennedy's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand) filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(White, Johnny) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#16

(#16) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. (White, Johnny) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendants Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc, United States Liability Insurance Company. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

14 #13

Exhibit M

14 #12

Exhibit L

14 #9

Exhibit I

14 #8

Exhibit H

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (White, Johnny) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

1 #13

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES LIABILITY INS

1 #12

Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. BREMER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED STAT

1 #11

Appendix Volume 11 of 11

1 #8

Appendix Volume 8 of 11

1 #6

Appendix Volume 6 of 11

1 #5

Appendix Volume 5 of 11

1 #4

Appendix Volume 4 of 11

1 #3

Appendix Volume 3 of 11

1 #1

Appendix Volume 1 of 11

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 (Filed in Support of Plaintiff Brian Kennedy's Reply in Support of Motion to Remand) filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(White, Johnny) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. (White, Johnny) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendants Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc, United States Liability Insurance Company. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Johnny White in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(White, Johnny) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. Motion set for hearing on 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (White, Johnny) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-05738 JAK(MRWx). (rn) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-05738 JAK(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/14/2022. (hc) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (hc) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT 10/01/2020 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 16 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT 10/01/2020 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 15 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ](sh) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy, upon Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company served on 8/14/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 08/19/2020 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 7 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy, upon Defendant Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc served on 8/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Peter H Schifrin in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 08/19/2020 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 6 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc, United States Liability Insurance Company., filed by Plaintiff Brian Kennedy. [FILED IN STATE COURT 07/29/2020 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ] (sh) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc identifying n/a as Corporate Parent. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) JOINDER filed by Defendant Schifrin Gagnon & Dickey, Inc joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 . (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company identifying U.S. Investment Corp.; Berkshire Hathaway, Inc as Corporate Parent. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV28704 Receipt No: ACACDC-33804461 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume 1 of 11, #2 Appendix Volume 2 of 11, #3 Appendix Volume 3 of 11, #4 Appendix Volume 4 of 11, #5 Appendix Volume 5 of 11, #6 Appendix Volume 6 of 11, #7 Appendix Volume 7 of 11, #8 Appendix Volume 8 of 11, #9 Appendix Volume 9 of 11, #10 Appendix Volume 10 of 11, #11 Appendix Volume 11 of 11, #12 Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. BREMER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF REMOVAL, #13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Attorney Jennifer Yu Sacro added to party United States Liability Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Sacro, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less