This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:24:57 (UTC).

Kennedy v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Kennedy filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeremy D. Kernodle and K. Nicole Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00587

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

Referral Judge

K. Nicole Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Kay Kennedy

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kami Lynn Nedbalek

Attorney at Attorney at Law

4501 Inverness

Tyler, TX 75703

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/09/19. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and emailed to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es))(mll, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/09/19. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Kay Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nedbalek, Kami) (Entered: 12/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner, Social Security Administration, filed by Jennifer Kay Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nedbalek, Kami) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less