This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2020 at 09:09:56 (UTC).

Kennedy v. Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 Kennedy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00041

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tasya Kennedy

Defendants

Gene B. Glick Company, Inc.

Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brenton D. Stanley

Defendant Attorneys

Charles H. Cassis

Samuel Earl Towns Jones

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Record

1 #3

Exhibit State Notice of Removal

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#11

#12

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: That Stanley's renewed motion to withdraw as counsel #9 isGRANTED and Kennedy shall have thirty days to secure counsel or proceed pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 5/20/2020. (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership identifying Other Affiliate Gene B. Glick Company, Inc. for Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership.. (Jones, Samuel) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Samuel Jones. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Edward B. Atkins for review: re #9 SECOND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tasya Kennedy (ECO) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SECOND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tasya Kennedy Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stanley, Brenton) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (ECO). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: That Stanley's motion to withdraw as counsel #7 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 5/14/2020. (ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tasya Kennedy Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. (Stanley, Brenton) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING by Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership Notice of Service of its Disc Req to Pltf (Jones, Samuel) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gene B. Glick Company, Inc.. (Jones, Samuel) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER : 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings is required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William 0. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010. (SLG)cc: COR (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Samuel E.T. Jones. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership and Gene B. Glick Company, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLG) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (SLG) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00323. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4628031), filed by Gene B. Glick Company, Inc., Cambridge Square of Covington, Limited Partnership.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record, #3 Exhibit State Notice of Removal)(SLG) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less