This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:50:51 (UTC).

Kennedy v. GEICO General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Kennedy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louis Guirola, Jr

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr.

Defendants

GEICO General Insurance Company

Michael D. Boehm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell Stephen Gill

Attorney at RUSSELL S. GILL, PLLC

638 Howard Avenue

Biloxi, MS 39530

Joseph R. Tramuta

Attorney at RUSSELL S. GILL, PLLC

638 Howard Avenue

Biloxi, MS 39530

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Paul Savarese, Jr.

Attorney at HOLTSFORD GILLILAND HIGGINS HITSON HOWARD, PC - Daphne

29000 U. S. Highway 98, Suite B-101

Daphne, AL 36526

Daniel T. Seawell

Attorney at OWEN, GALLOWAY & MYERS, PLLC

P.O. Drawer 420, 1414 25Th Avenue (39501)

Gulfport, MS 39502-0420

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , and MOTION to Remand filed by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#12

(#12) **DISREGARD**Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings of Court Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by GEICO General Insurance Company (Seawell, Daniel) Modified on 1/15/2020 (JCH). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Interested Parties by GEICO General Insurance Company (Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by GEICO General Insurance Company. Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Harrison County Circuit Court Agreed Final Judgment of Dismissal of Defendant Michael D. Boehm, Only)(Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - State Court Case File

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Summons

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO General Insurance Company for GEICO General Insurance Company. (Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit 1-Harrison County Circuit Court Agreed Final Judgment of Dismissal of De

#5

(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Seawell on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Seawell, Daniel) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Company from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401-18-272. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4174247) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Case File, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal in State Court, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Geico business information, #7 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel, #8 Exhibit 7 - Agreed Final Judgment of Dismissal)(JCH) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit 7 - Agreed Final Judgment of Dismissal

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Court Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by GEICO General Insurance Company (Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 1/10/2020. (SR) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , and MOTION to Remand by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting the #13 Joint Motion to Stay Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The parties' request to stay briefing and ruling on the #9 Motion to Remand for a period a 60 days to allow for mediation is hereby granted. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand is due March 16, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply will be due March 23, 2020. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 1/16/2020 (MG) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings on Court Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by GEICO General Insurance Company (Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 12. Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Section 2.C. and FED.R.Civ.P.11 an attorney's password issued by the court combined with the user's identification (login) serves as the attorney's signature for Rule 11 and other purposes. Attorneys should not permit other attorneys to use their login and password for any ECF filing. Document # 12 will be disregarded and the attorney with the electronic signature on the document should re-file document. (JCH) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **DISREGARD**Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings of Court Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by GEICO General Insurance Company (Seawell, Daniel) Modified on 1/15/2020 (JCH). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 1/10/2020 (SR) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 1/10/2020. (SR) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 7. Attorney is advised that a Motion should not have been combined with this document. This same pdf should also be filed as a Motion to Remand. After the motion is correctly filed, attorney should re-file document # 8 (Memorandum in Support) and link it to the newly filed motion only. In the future a motion should not be combined with any other pleading. (JCH) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , and MOTION to Remand filed by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , and MOTION to Remand by Anthony R. Kennedy, Sr (Tramuta, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T. Seawell on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Seawell, Daniel) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 2 and # 3. Attorney is advised that all future filings should have a complete case number listed: 1:20cv5 LG-RHW. (JCH) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by GEICO General Insurance Company. Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Harrison County Circuit Court Agreed Final Judgment of Dismissal of Defendant Michael D. Boehm, Only)(Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Interested Parties by GEICO General Insurance Company (Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO General Insurance Company for GEICO General Insurance Company. (Savarese, Steven) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Company from Harrison County Circuit Court - First Judicial District, case number A2401-18-272. Lower court jury demand. (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0538-4174247) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Case File, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Removal in State Court, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit 5 - Geico business information, #7 Exhibit 6 - Correspondence from Plaintiff's counsel, #8 Exhibit 7 - Agreed Final Judgment of Dismissal)(JCH) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.