This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2021 at 09:36:40 (UTC).

Kennedy v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 Kennedy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00199

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Kennedy

Defendant

Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E. Hairston, Jr.

Attorney at Hairston Lane Brannon, PA

434 Fayetteville St.

Raleigh, NC 27602

Moses Vincent Brown

Attorney at The Law Offices of Moses V. Brown, PLLC

531 Sunset Avenue

Rocky Mount, NC 27804

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret M. Manos

Attorney at Fisher Phillips LLP

227 West Trade Street, Suite 2020

Charlotte, NC 28202

J Stanton Hill

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

Nancy E. Rafuse

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

1075 Peachtree St., Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

15 #1

Exhibit A - Stipulated Confidentiality Protective Order

#10

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Supplement Removal Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - the Summons and the Complaint on Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribu

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - the Summons and the Complaint on Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corpora

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - the Summons and the Complaint on Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

#1

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Selection of Patricia Holland as mediator filed by Amy Kennedy. (Brown, Moses) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Amy Kennedy as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc & Abbott Marketing and Distribution Company. (Brown, Moses) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #23 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The defendants have filed an answer to the complaint in this matter on 5/6/21 at #10 . In order for the court to terminate these defendants, you must file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and attorneys for all parties must sign the stipulation of dismissal. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Amy Kennedy as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc & Abbott Marketing and Distribution Company. (Brown, Moses) Modified on 6/4/2021 (Sellers, N.). (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 5/26/2021. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Nancy E. Rafuse on behalf of All Defendants. (Rafuse, Nancy) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality Protective Order filed by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co.. (Hill, J Stanton) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER regarding #15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. The proposed protective order [DE-15-1] is deficient in that paragraph 4 fails to comply with the court's Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Sections V.G and V.I.4 and Local Civil Rule 79.2 regarding the filing of sealed material. Section V.I.4 of the Policy Manual requires that "[a]ll proposed protective orders submitted to the court must contain the language in Section V. G.1 (a )(i) through [(v)] with respect to the filing of sealed material" (emphasis added). The parties shallcorrect this deficiency, and refile only the proposed protective order within seven (7) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 5/25/2021. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #15 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/24/2021. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by J Stanton Hill on behalf of All Defendants. (Hill, J Stanton) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Financial Disclosure Statement by Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co. identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co.. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiffs' Counsel, James E. Hairston, Jr. of Hairston Lane, P. A. at 434 Fayetteville St., Suite 2350, Raleigh, NC 27601 mailed via US Mail on April 29, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1(e)(1), once the special appearance counsel receives his login and password, they shall file their notice of special appearance so that they will be added to the docket to receive notices of electronic filing "NEF's". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Margaret M. Manos on behalf of All Defendants. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Margaret M. Manos on behalf of All Defendants. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Margaret M. Manos on behalf of All Defendants. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co. regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, Ex. 4 - Notice of Filing of Defendants' Notice of Removal. (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from State of North Carolina, County of Wake, Superior Court Division, case number 19-CVS-16967. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6014155), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - the Summons and the Complaint on Abbott Laboratories, Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - the Summons and the Complaint on Abbott Diabetes Care Sales Corporation, #3 Exhibit 3 - the Summons and the Complaint on Abbott Sales Marketing and Distribution Co., #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet) (Manos, Margaret) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less