This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 09:24:08 (UTC).

Kennedy et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Kennedy filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00514

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rodney Kennedy

Ramona Y. Kennedy

Defendants

BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

ETHICON, LLC

ETHICON INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KILA BRIGET BALDWIN

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER PC

1525 Locust St., 19Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

LEE B. BALEFSKY

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

1525 Locust Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

THOMAS MORIBONDO

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS MORIBONDO

1002 Robin Drive

West Chester, PA 19382

Defendant Attorneys

JON A. STRONGMAN

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

MICHAEL BONASSO

Attorney at FLAHERTY SENSABAUGH & BONASSO

Pobox 3843

Charleston, WV 25338-3843

JAMES H. KEALE

Attorney at SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

Three Gateway Center, 12Th Fl

Newark, NJ 07102

MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM

Attorney at TANENBAUM KEALE

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry St Suite 1301

Newark, NJ 07102

MELISSA A. MERK

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER, BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996

WILLIAM M. GAGE

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW O'MARA STEVENS & CANNADA

P.O. Box 22567

Jackson, MS 39225-2567

BENJAMIN M. WATSON

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

KARI L. SUTHERLAND

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW O'MARA, STEVENS & CANNADA, PLLC

1200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 205

Oxford, MS 38655

DAVID B. THOMAS

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN PLLC

300 Summers St Ste 1380, Pobox 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

CAROLINE DYE WALKER

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

1819 - 5Th Ave N Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SUSAN M. ROBINSON

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN PLLC

300 Summers St Ste 1380, Pobox 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

PHILIP J. COMBS

Attorney at FARMER, CLINE & ARNOLD

P.O. Box 3842

Charleston, WV 25338-3842

CHRISTY D. JONES

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy, Suite 1400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Laura H. Dixon

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

 

Court Documents

#57

56 #1

*Restricted*

#56

#55

#54

#53

52 #16

Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7120 - Notice of Adoption

52 #15

Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7116 - Notice of Adoption

#47

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

186 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketMAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #57 TO COUNSEL ON 2/16/21. (jaa, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED AND COPIES (NOT MAILED TO ATTORNEYS) E-MAILED. (er, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-16859. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Melissa A. Merk on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting #47 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Ramona Y. Kennedy, Rodney Kennedy to Dismiss Boston Scientific Corporation Without Prejudice, Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation only is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/3/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6858 - Notice of Adoption, #2 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6860 - Notice of Adoption, #3 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6922 - Notice of Adoption, #4 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6926 - Notice of Adoption, #5 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6951 - Notice of Adoption, #6 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6960 - Notice of Adoption, #7 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6963 - Notice of Adoption, #8 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6965 - Notice of Adoption, #9 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6966 - Notice of Adoption, #10 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6986 - Notice of Adoption, #11 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6993 - Notice of Adoption, #12 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6998 - Notice of Adoption, #13 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7093 - Notice of Adoption, #14 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7100 - Notice of Adoption, #15 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7116 - Notice of Adoption, #16 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7120 - Notice of Adoption, #17 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7123 - Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7143 - Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #7152 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/8/2020 to remove terminated party filer and to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4573 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4573 Part 2 - Motion to Eclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4573 Part 3 - Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4573 Part 4 - Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4574 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4675 Part 1 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4675 Part 2 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #4692 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5332 - Motion to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5333 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5339 Part 1 - Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5339 Part 2 - Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5340 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5482 - Response Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5491 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #5548 - Reply in Support of Defs Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6641 - Notice of Adoption, #18 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6648 - Notice of Adoption, #19 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6796 - Notice of Adoption, #20 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6824 - Notice of Adoption, #21 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6833 - Amended Notice of Adoption, #22 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6840 - Notice of Adoption, #23 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6842 - Notice of Adoption, #24 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6846 - Notice of Adoption, #25 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #6852 - Notice of Adoption)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/8/2020 to remove terminated party filer and add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2488 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2552 Part 3 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2815 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2817 - Defs Motion to Exclude, #7 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2818 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2825 - Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2826 - Memo in Support to Exclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2910 - Notice of Response and Adoption, #11 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2916 - Def Response in Opposition to Plfs Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2931 - Memo by All Plfs in Opposition to Defs Motion to Exclude, #13 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2942 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #14 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2952 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #15 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2993 - Plfs Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude, #16 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3024 - Reply by Ethicon in Support of Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3053 - Reply by All Plfs in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3626 Part 1 - Motion to Limit, #19 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3626 Part 2 - Motion to Limit, #20 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3630 - Memo in Support of Motion to Limit, #21 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 1 - Response by Defs in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 2 - Response by Defs in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 3 - Response by Defs in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3767 Part 4 - Response by Defs in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #3855 - Reply in Support of Motion to Limit the Testimony)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/8/2020 to remove terminated party filer and add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2065 - Memo i Support of Motion to Exclude, #2 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2069 - Memo in Support of Daubert Motion to Preclude, #3 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2082 Part 1 - Motion by Ethicon to Exclude, #4 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2082 Part 2 - Motion by Ethicon to Exclude, #5 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2082 Part 3 - Motion by Ethicon to Exclude, #6 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2115 - Motion to Exclude Testimony, #7 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2116 - Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #8 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2134 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #9 Exhibit CF #2184 Part 1 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Preclude, #10 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2184 Part 2 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Preclude, #11 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2191 - Amended Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #12 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2201 - Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Brian Raybon, #13 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 1 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude Opinions, #14 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 2 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude Opinions, #15 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2205 Part 3 - Motion by All Plfs to Exclude Opinions, #16 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2206 - Memo in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #17 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2231 - Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude, #18 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2232 - Plfs Reply in Support of Their Daubert Motion to Exclude, #19 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2255 - Reply to Response in Opposition to Daubert Motion to Preclude, #20 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2264 - Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Exclude, #21 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2287 Part 1 - Defs Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #22 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2287 Part 2 - Defs Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude, #23 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2297 - Plfs Reply to Defs Response in Opposition of Motion to Exclude, #24 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2417 - Motion to Exclude, #25 Exhibit ECF #48 CONTINUED, ECF #2466 - Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/8/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Ramona Y. Kennedy. (Moribondo, Thomas) (Modified on 6/23/2017 to correct appearance of image (document originally appeared upside down)) (skh). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 05/12/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/13/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 08/05/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 53 (AGREED ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS) entered on 06/12/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/08/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2514493. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 07/03/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KILA BRIGET BALDWIN