This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2022 at 08:05:41 (UTC).

Kennedy, Arthur v. Lemerand, Kaitlyn et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Kennedy, Arthur filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lemerand, Kaitlyn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur M. Kennedy, IV

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

Nurse Kaitlyn Lemerand

RN Bonnie Alt

Nurse Rachel Pafford

Ms. Block

Melissa Block

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Arthur M. Kennedy, IV. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

1 #1

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Arthur M. Kennedy, IV. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 97.03 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 1/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/04/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketInitial Partial Filing fee received: $ 97.03, receipt number 34690040002. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 97.03 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 1/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/04/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiffs Arthur M. Kennedy, IV. (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Arthur M. Kennedy, IV. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Arthur M. Kennedy, IV. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CCI Prison Facility is a litigant