This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 05:14:28 (UTC).

Kenlock v. Orange County, New York et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Kenlock filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Orange County, New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-03693

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr. Orville Kenlock

Orville Kenlock

Defendants

Sgt. K. Kiszka

Officer Bloise

Anthony M. Mele

Goshen, NY 10924

Line Officers John "Does"

Sheriff Carl E. DuBois

Pam "Doe"

Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail)

J. Potter

Orange County, New York

Lieutenant J. Potter

Colonel Anthony M. Mele

Sergeant K. Kiszka

Officers "John Does"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Bruce Ranis

Attorney at Michael Ranis, Attorney at Law

45 St. John St.

Goshen, NY 10924

James I. Meyerson

510 Fifth Avenue, 3Rd Floor #335

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pam "Doe"(Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail) Mental Health Services Provider, in her individual capacity), Pam "Doe"(Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail) Mental Health Services Provider, in her offical capacity), Bloise, Bloise, "John Does"(Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail) Line and Command Officers, in their official capacities), "John Does"(Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail) Line and Command Officers, in their individual capacities), Carl E. DuBois, Carl E. DuBois, K. Kiszka, K. Kiszka, Anthony M. Mele, Anthony M. Mele, Orange County, New York, J. Potter(Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail) Lieutenant, in his official capacity), J. Potter(Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail) Lieutenant, in his individual capacity)..(jgo) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ORANGE COUNTY, NEW YORK, CARL E. DUBOIS, ANTHONY M. MELE, BLOISE, K. KISZKA, J. POTTER, PAM "DOE", "JOHN "DOES" OFFICERS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SEE ATTACHED RIDER, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Bruce Ranis to RE-FILE Document No. #12 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Include "See attached rider" in the defendant name and address field;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ORANGE COUNTY, NEW YORK, a municipal entity, Et. al, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) Modified on 6/18/2020 (pc). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Michael Bruce Ranis to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the standard AO 440 summons form not the FIOA summons form. Party names must EXACTLY match what is listed on the complaint caption title. If the caption title does not fit, list the first listed defendant and use "Et al." Create one summons form and use a rider listing every defendant and their addresses;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIEUTENANT J. POTTER, in his individual and official capacities, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES PROVIDER PAM DOE, in her individual and official capacities, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to COLONEL ANTHONY M. MELE, in his individual and official capacities, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LINE AND COMMAND JOHN DOES OFFICERS, in their individual and official capacities, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James I. Meyerson on behalf of Orville Kenlock..(Meyerson, James) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Pam "Doe" in her individual and official capacities, J. Potter, in his individual and official capacities, J. Bloise, in his individual and official capacities, Anthony M. Mele, in his individual and official capacities, "John" M. "Does" in their individual and official capacities, Carl E. Dubois, in his individual and official capacities, K. Sergeant Kiszka, in his individual and official capacities added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,.Document filed by Orville Kenlock. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(Ranis, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Bruce Ranis re: Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Pam "Doe", John "Does", J. Potter, Bloise, Carl E. DuBois, K. Kiszka, and Anthony M. Mele must each be added to the case a second time with party text "in their official capacity/capacities". Docket the event type ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Bruce Ranis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Pam "Doe", John "Does", J. Potter, Bloise, Carl E. DuBois, K. Kiszka, Anthony M. Mele, Orange County, New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Michael Bruce Ranis. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail). The party was added to the case in error. (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ranis, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pam "Doe", John "Does", Bloise, Carl E. DuBois, K. Kiszka, Anthony M. Mele, Orange County, New York, Orange County, New York Correctional Facility (Jail), J. Potter. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19809241)Document filed by Orville Kenlock..(Ranis, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County New York Department of Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James I Meyerson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Bruce Ranis