This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:06:34 (UTC).

KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC et al v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01835

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kenecott Utah Copper LLC

U.S. Borax Inc.

Rio Tinto Energy America Inc.

Defendants

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Courtney Kasuboski

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN

1300 I Street Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Linda Sue Stein

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Molly Bruder Fox

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Juan Arteaga

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

590 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Eric Fanchiang

Attorney at CROWELL& MORING LLP

3 Park Plaza, Ste 20 Flr

Irvine, CA 92614

Kent Alan Gardiner

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Luke P. van Houwelingen

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., 1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2595

Mara Lieber

Attorney at CROWELL & MORING LLP

590 Madison Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Tara L. Reinhart

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Tyrone R. Childress

Attorney at JONES DAY

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2300

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#6

5 #1

Notice and Consent

5 #5

Main Document

#4

#704

#703

#3

#2

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Reinhart, Tara) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Kennecott Utah Copper LLC, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-01835-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC..(Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Kennecott Utah Copper LLC, et al. v. BNSF Railway Company, et al., No. 1:21-cv-01835-BAH) by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Arteaga, Juan) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Fanchiang on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Fanchiang, Eric) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Lieber on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Lieber, Mara) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Luke P. van Houwelingen on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (van Houwelingen, Luke) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Alan Gardiner on behalf of CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Gardiner, Kent) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Majoras on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Majoras, John) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tyrone R. Childress on behalf of UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY (Childress, Tyrone) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021; UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY served on 7/14/2021, answer due 8/4/2021 by KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., U.S. BORAX INC. . (Kasuboski, Courtney) Modified docket event/text on 7/16/2021 (eg). (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ERRATA by KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC., U.S. BORAX INC. re #1 Complaint, filed by KENECOTT UTAH COPPER LLC, U.S. BORAX INC., RIO TINTO ENERGY AMERICA INC.. (Kasuboski, Courtney) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to courtneykasuboski@quinnemanuel.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-mc-00008. (Kasuboski, Courtney) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc. (Kasuboski, Courtney) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8588190) filed by Kenecott Utah Copper LLC, Rio Tinto Energy America Inc., U.S. Borax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kasuboski, Courtney) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. BORAX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CSX Transportation Inc is a litigant