This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2021 at 09:46:52 (UTC).

Kendall v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Kendall filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Love's Travel Stops Country Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03519

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rebecca Kendall

Defendant

Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Christopher Cowdin

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Sara Lyn Faulman

Attorney at McGillivary Steele Elkin LLP

1101 Vermont Avenue Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Jim Goh

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Erin Rayner Mangum

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Street, Suite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #2

Continuation of Main Document

5 #1

Continuation of Main Document

#5

#4

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Email to Ruiz

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Form

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jim Goh added to party Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.(pty:dft) by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc..(Goh, Jim) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. answer due 1/14/2021, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/23/2020.(jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.. (Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Kendall. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (Cowdin, Ryan) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/2/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/23/2021, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Christopher Cowdin on behalf of Rebecca KendallAttorney Ryan Christopher Cowdin added to party Rebecca Kendall(pty:pla) (Cowdin, Ryan) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7607912)Attorney Sara Lyn Faulman added to party Rebecca Kendall(pty:pla), filed by Rebecca Kendall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Email to Ruiz, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faulman, Sara) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin R. Mangum