This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2020 at 07:53:24 (UTC).

Kenco Logistic Services, LLC v. Kids II, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Kenco Logistic Services, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kids II, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01129

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenco Logistic Services, LLC

Defendant

Kids II, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles B. Lee

Attorney at Miller & Martin PLLC (Chattanooga Office)

Volunteer Building, 832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1200

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Scott E. Simmons

Attorney at Miller & Martin PLLC (Chattanooga Office)

Volunteer Building, 832 Georgia Avenue, Suite 1200

Chattanooga, TN 37402

John F. Horvath

Attorney at Horvath & Weaver, P.C.

10 S. Lasalle Street, Suite 1600

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#8

(#8) MOTION for attorney John Horvath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

7 #1

Attachment Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for attorney John Horvath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3079525) by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons issued as to Kids II, Inc. (gb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Lee, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 01:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit (H) Affidavit of Tiffany Castleberry

1 #7

Exhibit (G) Letter

1 #6

Exhibit (F) Fifth Amendment

1 #5

Exhibit (E) Fourth Amendment

1 #4

Exhibit (D) Third Amendment

1 #3

Exhibit (C) Second Amendment

1 #2

Exhibit (B) First Amendment

1 #1

Exhibit (A) Kenco Services Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kids II, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3050847), filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) Kenco Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit (B) First Amendment, #3 Exhibit (C) Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit (D) Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit (E) Fourth Amendment, #6 Exhibit (F) Fifth Amendment, #7 Exhibit (G) Letter, #8 Exhibit (H) Affidavit of Tiffany Castleberry, #9 Exhibit (H1) August 9 2019 Invoice, #10 Exhibit (H2) September 6 2019 Invoice, #11 Exhibit (H3) October 4, 2019 Invoice, #12 Exhibit (I) August 28 Letter, #13 Exhibit (J) October 2, Letter)(gb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2019: #14 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (gb). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The Certificate of Good Standing must be from a United States District Court or a United States appellate court. The new certificate shall be filed within 10 days. (gb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketIL State Bar status verified as active for John F. Horvath. (gb) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for attorney John Horvath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Simmons, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether disciplinary proceedings by any disciplinary authority, a finding of contempt or a sanction under 28 U.S.C. 1927 by any court, or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing such matters. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for attorney John Horvath to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3079525) by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to Kids II, Inc. (gb) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Lee, Charles) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 01:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Charles B. Lee and Scott E. Simmons. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Kids II, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-3050847), filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) Kenco Services Agreement, #2 Exhibit (B) First Amendment, #3 Exhibit (C) Second Amendment, #4 Exhibit (D) Third Amendment, #5 Exhibit (E) Fourth Amendment, #6 Exhibit (F) Fifth Amendment, #7 Exhibit (G) Letter, #8 Exhibit (H) Affidavit of Tiffany Castleberry, #9 Exhibit (H1) August 9 2019 Invoice, #10 Exhibit (H2) September 6 2019 Invoice, #11 Exhibit (H3) October 4, 2019 Invoice, #12 Exhibit (I) August 28 Letter, #13 Exhibit (J) October 2, Letter)(gb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2019: #14 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet) (gb). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kenco Logistic Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Kids Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E Simmons

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles B Lee