This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 06:00:34 (UTC).

Kenaitze Indian Tribe et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Kenaitze Indian Tribe filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against McKinsey Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04483

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arctic Slope Native Association

Eastern Aleutian Tribes

Asacarsarmiut Tribe

Chugachmiut, Inc.

Akiak Native Community

Native Village of Port Heiden

Kenaitze Indian Tribe

Tanana Chiefs Conference

Copper River Native Association

Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation

Defendant

McKinsey & Company Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry J. Avery

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling

1904 Third Avenue, Suite 1030

Seattle, WA 98101

Donald J. Simon

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Endreson Perry, LLP

1425 K Street, N.W., Suite 600

Washington, DC 20005

Dan Drachler

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

1904 Third Avenue, Suite 1030

Seattle, WA 98101-1170

Mark P. Chalos

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

222 Second Avenue South, Suite 1640

Nashville, TN 37201

Lloyd B. Miller

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Miller Monkman, LLP

725 East Fireweed Lane, Suite 420

Anchorage, AK 99503

Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Eric B. Fastiff

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Elizabeth Joan Cabraser

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Paulina do Amaral

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kevin R. Budner

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Defendant Attorney

Amanda K. Baker

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

*Restricted*

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to

#9

#8

#7

6 #6

Exhibit D-3

6 #5

Exhibit D-2

6 #3

Exhibit C

#6

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina do Amaral (do Amaral, Paulina) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ian Levin-Gesundheit (Levin-Gesundheit, Michael) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin R. Budner (Budner, Kevin) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fastiff (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED re MDL 2996: United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (Cleveland), 1:21-op-45028-DAP, Kenaitze Indian Tribe, et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-04483-CRB pursuant to Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio (Cleveland); Case Number 1:21-op-45028-DAP. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received. (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer(P,R) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)Related document(s) #1 .(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Donald J. Simon filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (P,R) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Lloyd B Miller filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing With the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5, #9 Exhibit D-6, #10 Exhibit D-7, #11 Exhibit D-8, #12 Exhibit D-9, #13 Exhibit D-10, #14 Exhibit D-11, #15 Exhibit D-12, #16 Exhibit D-13, #17 Exhibit D-14, #18 Exhibit D-15, #19 Exhibit D-16, #20 Exhibit D-17, #21 Exhibit E)(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Baker filed by on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Dan Drachler filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Appearance by Henry J. Avery filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with Jury Demand against McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing Fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10664926. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Tanana Chiefs Conference, Eastern Aleutian Tribes, Asacarsarmiut Tribe, Chugachmiut, Inc., Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Kenaitze Indian Tribe, Copper River Native Association, Akiak Native Community, Arctic Slope Native Association, Native Village of Port Heiden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chalos, Mark) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chugachmiut is a litigant

Latest cases where Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dena' Nena' Henash d/b/a Tanana Chiefs Conference is a litigant

Latest cases where AKIAK NATIVE COMMUNITY is a litigant