This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 06:56:09 (UTC).

Kenaitze Indian Tribe et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Kenaitze Indian Tribe filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKinsey Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45028

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Arctic Slope Native Association

Eastern Aleutian Tribes

Asacarsarmiut Tribe

Chugachmiut, Inc.

Akiak Native Community

Native Village of Port Heiden

Kenaitze Indian Tribe

Tanana Chiefs Conference

Copper River Native Association

Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation

Defendant

McKinsey & Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark P. Chalos

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein - Nashville

One Nashville Place, 150 Fourth Avenue, N

Nashville, TN 37219

Dan Drachler

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein

1904 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Donald J. Simon

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Endreson & Perry

1425 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Henry J. Avery

Attorney at Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling

1904 Third Avenue

Seattle, WA 98101

Lloyd B Miller

Attorney at Sonosky Chambers Sachse Endreson & Perry

1425 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 2005

Defendant Attorney

Amanda K. Baker

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer(P,R) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

#8

(#8) Attorney Appearance by Donald J. Simon filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (P,R) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by Lloyd B Miller filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#5

(#5) Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Baker filed by on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#4

(#4) Attorney Appearance by Dan Drachler filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Attorney Appearance by Henry J. Avery filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-04483, filed 06/10/2021. Related document(s) #10 . (M,TL) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Transfer Order by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In re: MDL 2996 McKinsey & Company, Inc., National Prescription Consultant Litigation. Case transferred to the Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer(P,R) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)Related document(s) #1 .(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Donald J. Simon filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (P,R) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Lloyd B Miller filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing With the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed by McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-1, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit D-3, #7 Exhibit D-4, #8 Exhibit D-5, #9 Exhibit D-6, #10 Exhibit D-7, #11 Exhibit D-8, #12 Exhibit D-9, #13 Exhibit D-10, #14 Exhibit D-11, #15 Exhibit D-12, #16 Exhibit D-13, #17 Exhibit D-14, #18 Exhibit D-15, #19 Exhibit D-16, #20 Exhibit D-17, #21 Exhibit E)(Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Amanda K. Baker filed by on behalf of McKinsey & Company, Inc.. (Baker, Amanda) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Appearance by Dan Drachler filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Drachler, Dan) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. McKinsey & Company, Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Appearance by Henry J. Avery filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Avery, Henry) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against McKinsey & Company, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10664926. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-DAP. Filed by Tanana Chiefs Conference, Eastern Aleutian Tribes, Asacarsarmiut Tribe, Chugachmiut, Inc., Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Kenaitze Indian Tribe, Copper River Native Association, Akiak Native Community, Arctic Slope Native Association, Native Village of Port Heiden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chalos, Mark) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chugachmiut is a litigant

Latest cases where Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dena' Nena' Henash d/b/a Tanana Chiefs Conference is a litigant