This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2022 at 12:48:53 (UTC).

Kemp v. Mackey

Case Summary

On 01/15/2022 Kemp filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Mackey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheron Kemp

Defendant

Molly E. Mackey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark T. Lavery

Attorney at Langone Law LLC

2275 Half Day Road, Suite 346

Bannockburn, IL 60015

Defendant Attorneys

Peter D. Sullivan

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer W. Weller

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sheron Kemp; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19060944.(Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 3/16/2022 at 9:15 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Molly E. Mackey by Peter D. Sullivan (Sullivan, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Molly E. Mackey by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION by Defendant Molly E. Mackey for extension of time to file answer (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer W. Weller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/23/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's motion for 21-day enlargement of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #7 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 3/9/2022. No appearance necessary on 2/23/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each side to bear its own costs and fees. Telephone status hearing set for 3/16/2022 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed with prejudice and with each side to bear its own costs and fees. Telephone status hearing set for 3/16/2022 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant's motion for 21-day enlargement of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint #7 is granted. Responsive pleading to be filed by 3/9/2022. No appearance necessary on 2/23/2022. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer W. Weller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 2/23/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Molly E. Mackey for extension of time to file answer (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Molly E. Mackey by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Molly E. Mackey by Peter D. Sullivan (Sullivan, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Telephone status hearing is set for 3/16/2022 at 9:15 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sheron Kemp; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19060944.(Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Weller

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter D. Sullivan