This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 09:52:22 (UTC).

Keltner v. Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Keltner filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01656

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kevin Keltner

Kevin (I) Keltner

Defendants

Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC

The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.

Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The

Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc

Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC

Castalloy Corporation USA

New Castalloy PTY, LTD

Texoma Harley-Davidson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian M. Caplan

Attorney at Sawaya Law Firm

1600 North Ogden Street

Denver, CO 80218

Robert Dean Wilhite, III

Attorney at Sawaya Law Firm

1600 North Ogden Street

Denver, CO 80218

Sandra Lynn Hagen

Attorney at Sawaya Law Firm

1600 North Ogden Street

Denver, CO 80218

William Patrick Boyle

Attorney at Boyle Law Firm

3780 South Broadwaysuite 108

Englewood, CO 80113

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan A. Williams

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP-Denver

1225 17Th Streetsuite 2750

Denver, CO 80202

Kimberly Lynn Koehler

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP-Denver

1225 17Th Streetsuite 2750

Denver, CO 80202

Cheyenne A.E. Moore

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP-Denver

1400 Wewatta Streetsuite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Steven I. Klein

Attorney at Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell

300 South Orange Avenuelincoln Plaza

Orlando, FL 32801

David G. VanMeter, III

Attorney at SGR, LLC-Denver

3900 East Mexico Avenuesuite 700

Denver, CO 80210

Katharine L. Laubach

Attorney at SGR, LLC-Denver

3900 East Mexico Avenuesuite 700

Denver, CO 80210

 

Court Documents

28 #7

Exhibit G- NCP Company Profile

28 #6

Exhibit F- New Castalloy Pty Australian Record

28 #5

Exhibit E- Castalloy Colorado Sec. of State Record

28 #4

Exhibit D- Castalloy Corp Entity Record

28 #3

Exhibit C- Castalloy Wisconsin Corp. Record

28 #2

Exhibit B- Japanese Corp. Entity Doc

28 #1

Exhibit A- Sumitomo Cert of Records

28 #28

Main Document

#14

1 #12

Continuation of Main Document Corporate Disclosure Statement - SRU

1 #10

Continuation of Main Document Corporate Disclosure Statement - Goodyear Tire & R

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H - State Court Notice of Removal

1 #5

Exhibit E - Keltner Demand

1 #4

Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER The Court finds #28 The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.'s, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC's, and Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc.'s Response to #14 Order to Show Cause (the "Response") insufficient to demonstrate the Court's subject matter jurisdiction and thus insufficient to discharge the Order to Show Cause. More specifically, the Response fails to identify the citizenship of Defendants Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, Ltd. ("Goodyear Dunlop") and Texoma Harley-Davidson ("THD") for purposes of determining the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. The Response is silent as to the citizenship of Goodyear Dunlop. With regard to THD, the Response states that THD appears to be a "a tradename utilized by Calculated Risk Texoma, LP." The response, however, fails to identify the partners/membership of Calculated Risk Texoma, LP or the citizenship or those partners/members. Although the Response represents that THD's answer in this litigation states that the company "has no ties to the state of Colorado," THD's answer actually states only that "Calculated Risk Texoma, LP does not do business or otherwise operate in Colorado." [#25 at 3] Even if Calculated Risk Texoma, LP does not do business or otherwise operate in Colorado, one or more of its partners/members may be a citizen of Colorado. Accordingly, on or before 8/27/2021, the Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, and Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc. shall file a further response to the Order to Show Cause addressing these deficiencies. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/13/2021. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven I. Klein on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLCAttorney Steven I. Klein added to party Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Klein, Steven) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE to #26 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The, Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sumitomo Cert of Records, #2 Exhibit B- Japanese Corp. Entity Doc, #3 Exhibit C- Castalloy Wisconsin Corp. Record, #4 Exhibit D- Castalloy Corp Entity Record, #5 Exhibit E- Castalloy Colorado Sec. of State Record, #6 Exhibit F- New Castalloy Pty Australian Record, #7 Exhibit G- NCP Company Profile)(Williams, Ryan) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Defendants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, and Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc.'s Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause until 8/10/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/03/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause by Defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The, Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Ryan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Texoma Harley-Davidson.(Laubach, Katharine) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David G. VanMeter, III on behalf of Texoma Harley-DavidsonAttorney David G. VanMeter, III added to party Texoma Harley-Davidson(pty:dft) (VanMeter, David) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf Defendant Texoma Harley-Davidson by Katharine L. Laubach on behalf of Texoma Harley-DavidsonAttorney Katharine L. Laubach added to party Texoma Harley-Davidson(pty:dft) (Laubach, Katharine) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Defendants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, and Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause until 8/03/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/20/2021. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, ) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's Order to Show Cause by Defendants Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The, Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Ryan) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan A. Williams on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The, Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC (Williams, Ryan) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kimberly Lynn Koehler on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The, Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC Attorney Kimberly Lynn Koehler added to party Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Lynn Koehler added to party Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Kimberly Lynn Koehler added to party Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC (pty:dft) (Koehler, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint with supoorting documents upon Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc on 05/20/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, and Notice to Elect Exlusion upon Goodyear Tire and Rubber Co. on 05/26/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Notice to Elect Exclusion, Complaint, and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Defendant/Respondent on 05/20/2021 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Castalloy Corporation USA, Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, LTD, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co, The, Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC, New Castalloy PTY, LTD, Sumitomo Rubber North America, Inc, Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC, Texoma Harley-Davidson, filed by Kevin Keltner, Kevin (I) Keltner.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30884. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7918653), filed by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., Sumitomo Rubber USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit E - Keltner Demand, #6 Exhibit F - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Register of Actions, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Continuation of Main Document Corporate Disclosure Statement - Goodyear Tire & Rubber, #11 Continuation of Main Document Corporate Disclosure Statement - SRNA, #12 Continuation of Main Document Corporate Disclosure Statement - SRU)(Williams, Ryan) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMITOMO RUBBER NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Goodyear Dunlop Tires North America, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY is a litigant