This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2021 at 09:40:53 (UTC).

Eric Kelly v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America, et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Eric Kelly filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Unum Life Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00291

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Kelly

Defendants

Unum Life Insurance Company of America

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J McKennon

Attorney at McKennon Law Group PC

20321 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Michael Paul Lavigne

Attorney at McKennon Law Group APC

20321 Sw Birch Street, Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Karen T Tsui

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorenson LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#12

(#12) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America, (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 4/1/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Unum Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly, upon Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (esa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Eric Kelly. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30529846 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Eric Kelly(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America, (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 4/1/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Unum Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly, upon Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (esa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Eric Kelly. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30529846 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Eric Kelly. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Eric Kelly(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unum Life Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen T. Tsui

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Maguire