This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2022 at 10:35:32 (UTC).

Kelly v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 Kelly filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01880

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Kelly

Defendants

Hertz Corporation

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Isaac E Khalid

Attorney at Spencer H. Calahan, LLC

827 St. Louis St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Spencer Calahan

Attorney at Law Offices of Spencer H. Calahan, LLC

827 St. Louis Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorney

Peter M. Mansfield

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

9 #3

Proposed Order

9 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

9 #9

Main Document

8 #3

Proposed Order

8 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to United States by Terry Kelly. (Khalid, Isaac) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Spencer Calahan terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/12/2022. (mm) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

5 #1

Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

State Court Pleadings

4 #4

Main Document

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Certification

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Terry Kelly. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Khalid, Isaac) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFICIENT: MOTION to Remand by Terry Kelly. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Khalid, Isaac) Modified text on 7/13/2022 (mm). (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to United States by Terry Kelly. (Khalid, Isaac) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Spencer Calahan terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/12/2022. (mm) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Spencer H. Calahan as Attorney by Terry Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Khalid, Isaac) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Compliance by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Mansfield, Peter) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States of America. (lw) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial District Court, Parish of Tangipahoa, case number 2022-0000214, Div. A (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Peter M. Mansfield added to party United States of America(pty:dft).(Mansfield, Peter) Modified text on 6/24/2022 (lw). (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter M. Mansfield