This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:15:07 (UTC).

KELLY v. SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC,

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 KELLY filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-60054

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRIAN KELLY

Defendant

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Barbara Fernandez

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Suite 400

Miami, FL 33156-2741

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerk's Notice of Filing Fee transferred to 0:23-CV-60059 in the amount of $402.00 on 01/13/2023 re 1 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case,, (Zacarias, Hozac) (Entered: 03/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket(#1) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $402.00, receipt #AFLSDC-16237550, case filed date: 1/12/2023. No further entries will be made on this case. (bb) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less