This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 10:09:43 (UTC).

Kelly v. County of Onondaga et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Kelly filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against County of Onondaga. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mae A. D'Agostino and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-01335

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Kelly

Defendants

James Quigley

John Uzunoff

County of Onondaga

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Sivin

Attorney at Sivin, Miller & Roche LLP

20 Vesey Street, Suite 1400

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

John E. Heisler, Jr.

421 Montgomery Street, 10Th Floor

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Uzunoff.(Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James Quigley.(Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

7 #2

Affidavit of Service upon Quigley

7 #1

Affidavit of Service upon Uzunoff

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on County of Onondaga, John Uzunoff, and James Quigley on 11/09/2020, filed by Ryan Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon Uzunoff, #2 Affidavit of Service upon Quigley)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by County of Onondaga.(Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Heisler, Jr on behalf of County of Onondaga (Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

4 #2

Quigley

4 #1

Uzunoff

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to County of Onondaga, James Quigley, John Uzunoff. (Attachments: #1 Uzunoff, #2 Quigley)(nas ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2021 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (nas ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against County of Onondaga, James Quigley, John Uzunoff (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5295778) filed by Ryan Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nas ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John Uzunoff.(Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James Quigley.(Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for James Quigley answer due 11/30/2020; John Uzunoff answer due 11/30/2020. (nas, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on County of Onondaga, John Uzunoff, and James Quigley on 11/09/2020, filed by Ryan Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon Uzunoff, #2 Affidavit of Service upon Quigley)(Sivin, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by County of Onondaga.(Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Heisler, Jr on behalf of County of Onondaga (Heisler, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to County of Onondaga, James Quigley, John Uzunoff. (Attachments: #1 Uzunoff, #2 Quigley)(nas ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/6/2021 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (nas ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (nas, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against County of Onondaga, James Quigley, John Uzunoff (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5295778) filed by Ryan Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nas ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Sivin Esq.