This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2019 at 08:08:24 (UTC).

Kelly v. Collier

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 Kelly filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Collier. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02100

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tommie Newton Kelly

Houston, TX 77051

Respondent

Brian Lee Collier

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee. Any and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. To the extent necessary, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Case terminated on 7/10/2019 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Tommie Newton Kelly.(nortiz, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#4

(#4) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Tommie Newton Kelly, filed.(sgonzalez, 5) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER, the Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 filing fee within 15 days of this order. Failure to comply timely with this order will result in dismissal of this lawsuit. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tommie Newton Kelly, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee. Any and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. To the extent necessary, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Case terminated on 7/10/2019 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Tommie Newton Kelly, filed.(sgonzalez, 5) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER, the Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 filing fee within 15 days of this order. Failure to comply timely with this order will result in dismissal of this lawsuit. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Change of Address by Tommie Newton Kelly, filed. (nortiz, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Tommie Newton Kelly.(nortiz, 5) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.