This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2022 at 08:37:43 (UTC).

Kelly v. Allee Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Kelly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Allee Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-12910

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nikita Kelly

Defendant

Allee Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sharon S. Almonrode

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm, P.C.

950 West University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

E. Powell Miller

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Gregory A. Mitchell

Attorney at Lawyers Group of Michigan

26555 Evergreen Road, Suite 1315

Southfield, MI 48076

Philip L. Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Meegan Brooks

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza

Phillip J. DeRosier

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Meegan Brooks on behalf of Allee Group, LLC. (Brooks, Meegan) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer due by 2/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J. DeRosier on behalf of Allee Group, LLC. (DeRosier, Phillip) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory A. Mitchell appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Gregory) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Fraietta on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Allee Group, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Allee Group, LLC* (KBro) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Nikita Kelly. (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

1 #17

Exhibit P - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical

1 #16

Exhibit O - Tsai, Cranor, Acquisti, and Egelman, The Effect of Online Privacy In

1 #15

Exhibit N - Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their P

1 #9

Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committ

1 #8

Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Gen

1 #7

Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com

1 #6

Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009)

1 #5

Exhibit D - Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Garden and Gun Active Subscribers Mailing List

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Meegan Brooks on behalf of Allee Group, LLC. (Brooks, Meegan) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Answer due by 2/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J. DeRosier on behalf of Allee Group, LLC. (DeRosier, Phillip) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory A. Mitchell appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mitchell, Gregory) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Fraietta on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Allee Group, LLC served on 12/17/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Allee Group, LLC* (KBro) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (KBro) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Nikita Kelly. (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nikita Kelly against Allee Group, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8722317 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Garden and Gun Active Subscribers Mailing List, #3 Exhibit B - Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989, #4 Exhibit C - The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001), #5 Exhibit D - Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011), #6 Exhibit E - Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009), #7 Exhibit F - Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012), #8 Exhibit G - Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012), #9 Exhibit H - Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012), #10 Exhibit I - Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012), #11 Exhibit J - Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission, #12 Exhibit K - Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007, #13 Exhibit L - Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000), #14 Exhibit M - 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe, #15 Exhibit N - Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012), #16 Exhibit O - Tsai, Cranor, Acquisti, and Egelman, The Effect of Online Privacy Information on Purchasing Behavior, 22(2) Information Systems Research 254, 254 (2011), #17 Exhibit P - Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003), #18 Exhibit Q - Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)) (Miller, E.) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip J. DeRosier

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meegan Brooks