This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2023 at 09:05:25 (UTC).

Kelly et al v. Steinman et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2023 Kelly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Steinman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin Beaton and Lanny King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin Beaton

Referral Judge

Lanny King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Kelly

Intervenor Plaintiff

AIU Insurance Company

Defendants

David Steinman

Timmons Logistics Group, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John T. Maher

Steven C. Girsky

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy J. Walker

Defendant Attorneys

John M. Dunn

M. Tyler Reynolds

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. from Christian Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-99648, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3771489), filed by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - Intervening Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - NOF Notice of Removal, #5 Cover Sheet) (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Answer of Defendants

1 #3

Exhibit C - Intervening Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit D - NOF Notice of Removal

1 #5

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#3

(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#4

(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Christian Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal to John M. Dunn, attorney for Defendants. Reason for Deficiency: Missing 7.1 (a)(2) Disclosure Statement for David Steinman and Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/23/2023. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#6

(#6) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (Dunn, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (DeW). (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Tyler Reynolds on behalf of David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (Reynolds, M.) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#8

(#8) Proposed Order re #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC.. (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 4/3/2023. Telephonic Rule 15 Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2023 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for AIU Insurance Company. by AIU Insurance Company. (Walker, Timothy) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2023

Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 04/28/2023. Due to a scheduling conflict with counsel's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2023 is continued to 6/12/2023 at 2:30 p.m. Central Time before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to this conference by dialing the toll-free meeting number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577# when prompted. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(cc:counsel) (MHB) (Entered: 04/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for AIU Insurance Company. by AIU Insurance Company. (Walker, Timothy) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

Docket(#11) NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the #Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at # intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. (JM) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 4/3/2023. Telephonic Rule 15 Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2023 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577. cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge King for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge King may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Proposed Order re #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC.. (Dunn, John) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Tyler Reynolds on behalf of David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (Reynolds, M.) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (Dunn, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2023: #1 Proposed Order) (DeW). (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal to John M. Dunn, attorney for Defendants. Reason for Deficiency: Missing 7.1 (a)(2) Disclosure Statement for David Steinman and Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/23/2023. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Christian Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER to Complaint (Filed in Christian Circuit Court - See DN #1 -2.) by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. from Christian Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-99648, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3771489), filed by David Steinman, Timmons Logistics Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer of Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - Intervening Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - NOF Notice of Removal, #5 Cover Sheet) (CDL) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less