This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 07:19:46 (UTC).

Kelly et al v. Ancient Organics

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Kelly filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Ancient Organics. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-MC-80142

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Effinger Kelly

Keefe Stevenrnu

Defendant

Ancient Organics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Ryan Gustafson

Attorney at Good Gustafson Aumais LLP

2330 Westwood Blvd., Suite 103

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney Gustafson will file for refund and refile case correctly as a civil case. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2022) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName of Plaintiff #1 in ECF differs from that of the Civil Cover sheet and Complaint; Name of Defendant in ECF differs from that of Civil Cover sheet and Complaint. Please e-file an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Keefe Stevenrnu, Effinger Kelly (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17240573.). Filed byEffinger Kelly, Keefe Stevenrnu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 6/6/2022) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Ryan Gustafson