This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2019 at 07:46:14 (UTC).

Kelly et al v. America Multi-Cinema, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 Kelly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against America Multi-Cinema, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher L. Ray and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Renee Kelly

Cecil Kelly

Defendants

America Multi-Cinema, Inc

ABC Corporations 1-3

Jordan Kass

Jane Does 1-3

John Does 1-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashleigh Ruth Madison

Attorney at Southeast Law, LLC

2107 Bull Street

Savannah, GA 31401

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Atkinson

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree St., Ne, The Peachtree

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

Lauren Paine Kamensky

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

1355 Peachtree St., Ne, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Atkinson, David) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER directing counsel to resubmit the correct forms required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(F) within 14 days. (Compliance due by 7/15/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/1/19. (wwp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#11

(#11) Brief in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass. (Atkinson, David) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Atkinson, David) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand by Cecil Kelly, Renee Kelly. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Madison, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jordan Kass for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Cecil Kelly, Renee Kelly. (Madison, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Paine Kamensky on behalf of America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass (Kamensky, Lauren) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Ruth Madison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Madison, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass.(Atkinson, David) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

4 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Jordan Kass

4 #1

Briefs Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Jordan K

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jordan Kass for Fraudulent Joinder by America Multi-Cinema, Inc. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Jordan Kass for Fraudulent Joinder, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jordan Kass)(Atkinson, David) Modified on 5/30/2019 (wwp). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to all counsel that a #1 Notice of Removal was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. Set/Reset Deadlines: America Multi-Cinema, Inc answer due 6/5/2019; Jordan Kass answer due 6/5/2019. Notice of Appearance Compliance due by 6/8/2019. State Motions due by 6/12/2019. (wwp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Pleadings served with complaint

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhbit C - Sheriff's Entry of Service to Kass

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Complaint and Summons

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Atkinson, David) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER directing counsel to resubmit the correct forms required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(F) within 14 days. (Compliance due by 7/15/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/1/19. (wwp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Brief in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass. (Atkinson, David) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Atkinson, David) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand by Cecil Kelly, Renee Kelly. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Madison, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jordan Kass for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Cecil Kelly, Renee Kelly. (Madison, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Paine Kamensky on behalf of America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass (Kamensky, Lauren) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashleigh Ruth Madison on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Madison, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass.(Atkinson, David) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jordan Kass for Fraudulent Joinder by America Multi-Cinema, Inc. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Jordan Kass for Fraudulent Joinder, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jordan Kass)(Atkinson, David) Modified on 5/30/2019 (wwp). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to all counsel that a #1 Notice of Removal was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. Set/Reset Deadlines: America Multi-Cinema, Inc answer due 6/5/2019; Jordan Kass answer due 6/5/2019. Notice of Appearance Compliance due by 6/8/2019. State Motions due by 6/12/2019. (wwp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/29/19. (wwp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by America Multi-Cinema, Inc, Jordan Kass from Superior Court of Bulloch County, case number SUCV2019000166. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2612749). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate Entry KS MO #3 Exhbit C - Sheriff's Entry of Service to Kass, #4 Exhibit D - State Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Pleadings served with complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (wwp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.