This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:10:43 (UTC).

Kelly Bey v. Bechtold et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Kelly Bey against Bechtold in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01467

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

PT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

David F. Kelly Bey

Respondents

William Bechtold

Pennsylvania Attorney General Office

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Notice of Consent

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by David F. Kelly Bey.(lp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the petition in this action. Signed by LP on 09/04/2019. Order sent to Warden/Superintendent and petitioner.(lp) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by David F. Kelly Bey. Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (kpf) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

3 #1

IFP (habeas corpus)

#5

(#5) MOTION (Application) to Proceed in forma pauperis by David F. Kelly Bey.(kpf) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David F. Kelly Bey. (kpf) Modified on 9/16/2019 (lp). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the superintendent or warden of the institution at which Petitioner is currently incarcerated is directed to provide certified copies of the statement of Petitioner's trust fund account to this Court and to the Petitioner. The statement should reflect all activity in that account for the six-month period immediately preceding the lodging of the petition in this action. Signed by LP on 09/04/2019. Order sent to Warden/Superintendent and petitioner.(lp) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION (Application) to Proceed in forma pauperis by David F. Kelly Bey.(kpf) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT by David F. Kelly Bey. Amendment to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (kpf) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by David F. Kelly Bey.(lp) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.