This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2023 at 08:07:57 (UTC).

Kelley v. USAA Federal Savings Bank

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Kelley filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against USAA Federal Savings Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07333

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ihsan M. Kelley

Chicago, IL 60624

Defendant

USAA Federal Savings Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

David Matthew Krueger

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff Llp

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krueger, David) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by USAA Federal Savings Bank (Krueger, David) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#4

(#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to pro se litigant. (jn, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank (Krueger, David) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint in this case. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion by no later than 2/13/2023. Defendant is directed to file a reply to plaintiff's response by no later than 2/23/2023. The case is set for a telephonic hearing on 3/8/2023 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Both plaintiff and counsel for defendant are directed to call in at that time. The Court reserves the right to vacate the hearing if it determines a hearing is not needed. (mk) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#7

(#7) LETTER from Ihsan M. Kelley. (Attachments). (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#8

(#8) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ihsan M. Kelley. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Ihsan M. Kelley. (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER from Ihsan M. Kelley. (Attachments). (gcy, ) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint in this case. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion by no later than 2/13/2023. Defendant is directed to file a reply to plaintiff's response by no later than 2/23/2023. The case is set for a telephonic hearing on 3/8/2023 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Both plaintiff and counsel for defendant are directed to call in at that time. The Court reserves the right to vacate the hearing if it determines a hearing is not needed. (mk) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant USAA Federal Savings Bank (Krueger, David) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to pro se litigant. (jn, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (lm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by USAA Federal Savings Bank (Krueger, David) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krueger, David) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the State of Illinois, Cook County, case number (20221012951) filed by USAA Federal Savings Bank Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20183093. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Krueger, David) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less