Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:28:34 (UTC).

Kelley v. Saul

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Kelley filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M. Burgess. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00035

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M. Burgess

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Brian Kelley

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul B. Eaglin

Attorney at Eaglin Law Office

Po Box 6033

Syracuse, NY 13217-6033

Defendant Attorney

Steven E Skrocki

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Anch)

222 West 7Th Avenue, Rm 253 #9

Anchorage, AK 99513

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/25/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/10/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Brian Kelley. Andrew M. Saul served on 11/19/2020, answer due 1/18/2021. (Eaglin, Paul) (Entered: 11/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #8 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/25/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and SSA Comm'r (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 11/10/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT summons for Atty Gen Barr by David Brian Kelley re #4 Unissued Summons. (Eaglin, Paul) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant OGC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by David Brian Kelley.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by David Brian Kelley.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul B. Eaglin