This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:52:48 (UTC).

Sharon Lynn Kellaway v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Sharon Lynn Kellaway filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00943

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Lynn Kellaway

Defendants

Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shanny J Lee

Attorney at Charles E Binder and Harry J Binder LLP

485 Madison Avenue Suite 501

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Armand D Roth

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney SA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

411 West 4Th Street Suite 8000

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4599

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sharon Lynn Kellaway, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt, #2 Summons)(Lee, Shanny) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 the Case has been reassigned from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:19-cv-943-CAS-FFM. (ghap) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ghap) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Sharon Lynn Kellaway. (Lee, Shanny) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties (Lee, Shanny) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sharon Lynn Kellaway. (Lee, Shanny) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23758005 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Shanny J Lee added to party Sharon Lynn Kellaway(pty:pla))(Lee, Shanny) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.