This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 09:20:06 (UTC).

Kelaa v. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Kelaa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Diamond Resorts International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer A. Dorsey and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00554

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liliane Kelaa

Defendants

Diamond Resorts International, Inc.

Hilton Grand Vacations Inc.

Noah Bloom

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy L. Howard

Attorney at Hone Law

701 N. Green Valley Pkwy., Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89074

Jill Garcia

Attorney at Hone Law

701 N. Green Valley Parkway, Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89074

Kathryn Newman

Attorney at Hone Law

701 N. Green Valley Pkwy., Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89074

Defendant Attorneys

Diana Dickinson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, #300

Las Vegas, NV 89169-5937

Montgomery Y Paek

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Amy L Thompson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Liliane Kelaa. Replies due by 7/28/2022. (Garcia, Jill) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule re #16 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/21/2022. Replies due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #16 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Liliane Kelaa. (Newman, Kathryn) (extend) (sumjgm) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Corporation, Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc., Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Other Affiliate Hilton Grand Vacations Borrower LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Grand Vacations Parent LLC for Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. added. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#16

(#16) PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendants Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc.. Responses due by 7/14/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/14/2022. (Dickinson, Diana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Noah Bloom answer due 6/30/2022. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 6/30/2022. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 6/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc.. (Dickinson, Diana) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to extend time for defendants to file response to plaintiff's complaint. Noah Bloom answer due 6/16/2022. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 6/16/2022. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 6/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#12

(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to extend time for defendants to file response to plaintiff's complaint. Noah Bloom answer due 6/16/2022. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 6/16/2022. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 6/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#6

(#8) ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 5/26/2022; Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 5/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liliane Kelaa re #4 Summons Issued. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. served on 4/5/2022. (Howard, Amy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 4/22/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Liliane Kelaa. Replies due by 7/28/2022. (Garcia, Jill) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule re #16 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/21/2022. Replies due by 8/8/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #16 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Liliane Kelaa. (Newman, Kathryn) (extend) (sumjgm) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE Setting Hearing on #16 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2022 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. This hearing will be conducted in person. (no image attached) (DC) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney update in case: Attorney Montgomery Y Paek added for Defendants Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., and Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. as listed on the #16 Partial Motion to Dismiss. (SLD) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Corporation, Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc., Other Affiliate Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company, Other Affiliate Hilton Grand Vacations Borrower LLC, Other Affiliate Hilton Grand Vacations Parent LLC for Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. added. (Thompson, Amy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendants Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc.. Responses due by 7/14/2022. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/14/2022. (Dickinson, Diana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Noah Bloom answer due 6/30/2022. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 6/30/2022. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 6/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc.. (Dickinson, Diana) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to extend time for defendants to file response to plaintiff's complaint. Noah Bloom answer due 6/16/2022. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 6/16/2022. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 6/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liliane Kelaa re #4 Summons Issued. Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. served on 4/5/2022. (Howard, Amy) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer #1 Complaint. Diamond Resorts International, Inc. answer due 5/26/2022; Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. answer due 5/26/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc.. (Dickinson, Diana) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Case to Magistrate Judge. (Document restricted under General Order 2021-03.) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Noah Bloom, Diamond Resorts International, Inc., Hilton Grand Vacations Inc. re #1 Complaint. (DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-03. Attached is a form to indicate whether you consent or decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Please submit your consent or declination form within 21 days of filing your complaint or appearing as a defendant. See notice for details. Consent or declination is due by 4/22/2022. Please file the completed form under the filing event called Notice to Clerk - Consent or Declination in the Representation and Appearances civil menu category. (DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-6852236) by Liliane Kelaa. Proof of service due by 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Howard, Amy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILTON GRAND VACATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Diamond Resorts International Marketing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Montgomery Y Paek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana Dickinson