This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2020 at 08:19:59 (UTC).

Keith Wicker v. Triumph Group Aerospace Structures, et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Keith Wicker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06952

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Wicker

Defendants

Triumph Group Aerospace Structures

Triumph Aerostructures, LLC

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay S Rothman

Attorney at Jay S Rothman and Associates

21900 Burbank Boulevard Suite 210

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorneys

Robert R Vorhees

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

695 Town Center Drive Suite 1500

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Angela Pak

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

695 Town Center Drive 15Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Complaint

1 #3

Declaration Defendant Triumph Aerostructures, LLC (erroneously sued as Triumph G

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Robert Vorhees Re: (1) Filing of Notice of Removal and Notice to the Los Angeles County Superior Court and Service of Notice of Removal on Plaintiff; and (2) Filing of Proof of Service filed by Defendant Triumph Aerostructures, LLC. (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Triumph Aerostructures, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Triumph Group Aerospace Structures, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Keith Wicker. (filed in state court 6/11/20, submitted as documsent 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures, (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Robert Vorhees re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Rochelle Onate re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Katie Rykal re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. (Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV22076 Receipt No: ACACDC-27453699 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Triumph Group Aerospace Structures. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Declaration Defendant Triumph Aerostructures, LLC (erroneously sued as Triumph Group Aerospace Structures) (Attorney Robert R Vorhees added to party Triumph Group Aerospace Structures(pty:dft))(Vorhees, Robert) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIUMPH AEROSTRUCTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay S. Rothman