This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2019 at 08:18:34 (UTC).

Keith Moser v. Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 Keith Moser filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01823

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Moser

Defendants

Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Azuka L Uzoh

Attorney at Law Office of Azuka L Uzoh

1930 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1216

Los Angeles, CA 90057

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey Michael Cohon

Attorney at Law Offices of Jeffrey M Cohon APC

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 470

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge James V. Selna: On October 28, 2019, Plaintiff Keith Moser filed a First Amended Complaint. Dkt. No. 11. The Court therefore VACATES the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for November 18, 2019 (Dkt. No. 8) as MOOT. (es) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO PERMIT THE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AFTER THE FRCP 15 DEADLINE AND TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #12 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed on October 28, 2019 and that Defendants deadline to file and serve its response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be extended to November 27, 2019. (es) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

12 #1

Proposed Order on Stipulation To Permit The Filing Of Plaintiffs First Amended C

#12

(#12) STIPULATION for Leave to To Permit The Filing Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint After The FRCP 15 Deadline And To Extend Defendants Time To Respond To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation To Permit The Filing Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint After The FRCP 15 Deadline And To Extend Defendants Time To Respond To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint)(Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#11

(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Keith Moser amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Keith Moser(Uzoh, Azuka) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc., identifying CCMSI Holdings, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#9

(#9) DECLARATION of Jeffrey M Cohon Re Meet and Confer Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) #8 filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Initial Order Following Filing of Complaint Assigned to Judge Selna filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:19-cv-01823 JVS (ADSx). (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01091224 Receipt No: 0973-24483461 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Michael Cohon added to party Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTES [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge James V. Selna: On October 28, 2019, Plaintiff Keith Moser filed a First Amended Complaint. Dkt. No. 11. The Court therefore VACATES the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for November 18, 2019 (Dkt. No. 8) as MOOT. (es) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO PERMIT THE FILING OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AFTER THE FRCP 15 DEADLINE AND TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #12 by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be deemed filed on October 28, 2019 and that Defendants deadline to file and serve its response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be extended to November 27, 2019. (es) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION for Leave to To Permit The Filing Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint After The FRCP 15 Deadline And To Extend Defendants Time To Respond To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Stipulation To Permit The Filing Of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint After The FRCP 15 Deadline And To Extend Defendants Time To Respond To Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint)(Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff Keith Moser amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Keith Moser(Uzoh, Azuka) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc., identifying CCMSI Holdings, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of Jeffrey M Cohon Re Meet and Confer Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) #8 filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12(e) filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Initial Order Following Filing of Complaint Assigned to Judge Selna filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:19-cv-01823 JVS (ADSx). (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc., Does 1 through 100. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Keith Moser. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/19/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01091224 Receipt No: 0973-24483461 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey Michael Cohon added to party Cannon Cochran Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cohon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M. Cohon