1:23-CV-00658
01/24/2023
Disposed - Other Disposed
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Laura Taylor Swain
Mohammed Keita
State Farm Insurance
Progressive Insurance
Armando Berrios
POM Michael A. Meyerson
Sgt. Thomas N. Garguilo
Progressive Insurance
Michael V. Campanile
(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
RESTRICTED
(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Mohammed Keita consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes this action in this court. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/27/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 01/30/2023)
Main Document
Exhibit MEDICARE EXHIBITS
Docket(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Progressive Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MEDICARE EXHIBITS).(Campanile, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:23-cv-00949, filed on 2/6/2023. (sgz) (Entered: 02/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(vfr) (Entered: 02/06/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketTransmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #4 Order to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (vfr) Modified on 2/6/2023 (vfr). (Entered: 01/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes this action in this court. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/27/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 01/30/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Mohammed Keita consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) COMPLAINT against Armando Berrios, Thomas N. Garguilo, Michael A. Meyerson, Progressive Insurance, State Farm Insurance. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
[-] Read Less