This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2023 at 08:39:26 (UTC).

Keita v. State Farm Insurance et al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Keita filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State Farm Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00658

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammed Keita

Defendants and Cross Defendants

State Farm Insurance

Progressive Insurance

Armando Berrios

POM Michael A. Meyerson

Sgt. Thomas N. Garguilo

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant

Progressive Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Michael V. Campanile

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Mohammed Keita consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#4

(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes this action in this court. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/27/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit MEDICARE EXHIBITS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #2 Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Progressive Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MEDICARE EXHIBITS).(Campanile, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:23-cv-00949, filed on 2/6/2023. (sgz) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(vfr) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #4 Order to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (vfr) Modified on 2/6/2023 (vfr). (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this court. This order closes this action in this court. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/27/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Mohammed Keita consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Armando Berrios, Thomas N. Garguilo, Michael A. Meyerson, Progressive Insurance, State Farm Insurance. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Mohammed Keita. (sac) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less