This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2023 at 09:14:10 (UTC).

Keita v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Keita filed an Other lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Lois Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Lois Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammed Keita

Staten Island, NY 10305

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Fiat Chrysler Automobile

David Dennis Motor LLC

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mohammed Keita. (KD) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against David Dennis Motor LLC, FCA US LLC, filed by Mohammed Keita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KD) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted 14 days leave from the entry of this Order to pay the $402 filing fee in order to proceed with this action. If plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee to the Clerk of Court within the time allowed, the action shall be dismissed without prejudice. All further proceedings shall be stayed. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45(1962). SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/12/2023. (JT) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter to Judge Vitaliano from Mohammed Keita enclosed with paperwork in support of IFP application. (JT) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/13/2023) (JT). (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted 14 days leave from the entry of this Order to pay the $402 filing fee in order to proceed with this action. If plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee to the Clerk of Court within the time allowed, the action shall be dismissed without prejudice. All further proceedings shall be stayed. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45(1962). SO Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 1/12/2023. (JT) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mohammed Keita. (KD) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against David Dennis Motor LLC, FCA US LLC, filed by Mohammed Keita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KD) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less