This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2023 at 08:14:47 (UTC).

Keener v. Gilman North Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 Keener filed an Other lawsuit against Gilman North Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trevor Keener

Defendants

Gilman North Inc.

Gillman Auto Group d/b/a Gillman Acura of Houston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian J Lawler

Defendant Attorney

Pamela Banks Linberg

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Gilman North Inc., filed.(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Brian Joseph Lawler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trevor Keener, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2023. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Gilman North Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2023 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Brian J. Lawler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Trevor Keener, filed.(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gilman North Inc. served on 1/25/2023, answer due 3/27/2023, filed.(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gillman Auto Group, Gilman North Inc., filed.(Linberg, Pamela) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gillman Auto Group, Gilman North Inc., filed.(Linberg, Pamela) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Gilman North Inc. served on 1/25/2023, answer due 3/27/2023, filed.(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Trevor Keener, filed.(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Brian J. Lawler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/12/2023 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Gilman North Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Brian Joseph Lawler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Trevor Keener, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2023. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Gilman North Inc., filed.(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Gilman North Inc. filed by Trevor Keener. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less