This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2023 at 08:07:13 (UTC).

Keenan v. Diebold Incorporated

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Keenan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Diebold Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-11984

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Keenan

Defendant

Diebold Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jacob J. Lantry

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diebold Incorporated ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9597493 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Mtn to Appoint Special Server, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal - state district, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Mtn to Appoint Special Server

1 #3

Exhibit C - Statement of Damages

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Removal - state district

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Category Form

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO Atty. Kevin G. James - USDC - MA Attorney Status. (Attachments: #1 Re-Registration Notice, #2 Notice re-registration fee)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

4 #1

Re-Registration Notice

4 #2

Notice re-registration fee

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Diebold Incorporated.(Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diebold Incorporated. (Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#10

(#10) Attorney Certification Pursuant to Rule 83.5.3(f) by Kevin G. James (Warnock, Douglas) Modified date filed on 1/9/2023 (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 2/15/2023 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket(#12) Attorney Certification Pursuant to Rule 83.5.3(F) $ 100.00, receipt number 100001739 for 11 Notice (Other), (Phillips, Sophie) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: re #10 Attorney Certification Pursuant to Rule 83.5.3(f) by Kevin G. James. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Following registration, A Notice of Appearance must be electronically entered on the docket. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Copy re #8 Notice of Scheduling Conference mailed to Susan Keenan on 1/3/23. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 2/15/2023 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Attorney Certification Pursuant to Rule 83.5.3(f) by Kevin G. James (Warnock, Douglas) Modified date filed on 1/9/2023 (Warnock, Douglas). (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT Record. (Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Diebold Incorporated. (Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Diebold Incorporated.(Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO Atty. Kevin G. James - USDC - MA Attorney Status. (Attachments: #1 Re-Registration Notice, #2 Notice re-registration fee)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diebold Incorporated ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9597493 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Mtn to Appoint Special Server, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Damages, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Removal - state district, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Lantry, Jacob) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less